Accounts and annual returns CHEUNG'S CLANSMEN CHARITY (EUROPE) ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 242653
Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 09 February 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 March 2022 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 April 2021 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required