Accounts and annual returns GANNON INSTITUTE

Charity number: 242679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 April 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required