Financial history THE TRUST OF ST BENEDICT'S ABBEY EALING

Charity number: 242715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.55m £1.40m £1.54m £1.57m £1.61m
Total expenditure £1.90m £1.62m £1.57m £1.64m £1.66m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £100.00k £100.00k £100.00k £100.00k £82.73k
Income - Donations and legacies £579.79k £455.38k £645.41k £614.23k £585.12k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £298.29k £287.83k £249.15k £277.17k £270.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £605.35k £580.64k £632.51k £674.66k £736.92k
Income - Other £66.19k £72.17k £10.74k £7.75k £16.94k
Income - Legacies £47.52k £17.62k £209.88k £21.81k £2.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.88m £1.60m £1.55m £1.62m £1.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.86k £15.33k £15.12k £14.16k £13.47k
Expenditure - Governance £19.75k £15.00k £16.92k £17.86k £21.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £15.86k £15.33k £15.12k £14.16k £13.47k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0