THE COTTON INDUSTRY WAR MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
All aspects of aid and assistence to employees, former employees and students of the textile industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Lancashire
- Leeds City
Governance
- 10 August 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Douglas Jarvis | Chair | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Clay | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Davey | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Richard Booth | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN GEORGE ABEL | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alan Paul Robinson | Trustee | 21 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL GLOVER BARTLE | Trustee | 10 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ROBERT TROTTER | Trustee | 31 January 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £387.05k | £321.96k | £340.82k | £388.14k | £398.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £505.40k | £366.41k | £291.84k | £278.44k | £351.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
COTTON INDUSTRY WAR MEMORIAL TRUST ACT 1947 AND THE COTTON INDUSTRY WAR MEMORIAL TRUST ACT (AMENDMENT) ORDER 1971
Charitable objects
1. ASSISTANCE BY WAY OF GRANTS PENSIONS OR OTHER PAYMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF NECESSITOUS OR DISABLED OR DESERVING PERSONS, THEIR RELATIVES AND DEPENDANTS (DETAILS IN 12(I)(A). 2. ENDOWMENT, PURCHASE, MAINTAINING ETC OF CONVALESCENT HOMES. 3. ASSISTANCE IN SUCH EDUCATION CALCULATED TO ENCOURAGE EFFICIENCY IN INDUSTRY. 4. GRANTS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS FOR FUTHERANCE OF OBJECTS BENEFICIAL TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM. (A) RESEARCH (B) COMMONWEALTH COTTON PRODUCTION (C) COMPILATION OF STATISTICS. 5. CONTRIBUTIONS TO INSTITUTIONS OR PROVIDE SPECIAL MEDICAL FACILITIES FOR WORKERS IN THE INDUSTRY. 6. CONTRIBUTIONS TO ALLIED PURPOSES TO THOSE ABOVE-MENTIONED (FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 12 OF THE ACT.)
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 SHEPHERD STREET
ROCHDALE
OL11 5SU
- Phone:
- 01706341731
- Email:
- theciwmt@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window