JOSEPH FILDE'S CHARITY

Charity number: 242723
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help the poor

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £246

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Trafford

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 June 1965: Standard registration
  • 06 February 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £246
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 29 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 10 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 23 May 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 09 June 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required