Trustees THE BERRY HOUSING TRUST
Charity number: 242728

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR ROBERT NELSON | Chair | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Crisp | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MICHAEL BURLACE | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD HOGBIN | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALAN BULLOCK | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MATTICK | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
MELITA GANDOLFO | Trustee | 08 July 2019 |
|
|||||
YVONNE TISSON | Trustee | 07 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHAPMAN | Trustee | 02 July 2008 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.