JANE HIGGINSON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poor and in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
- Wrexham
Governance
- 23 November 1965: Standard registration
- HIGGINSON'S SCHOOL AND CHARITY (EXCLUSIVE OF HIGGINSON'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION) (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Christopher Precious | Chair | 10 March 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Wendy Marie Kay | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|||||||||
Jennet Elisabeth Reeves | Trustee | 09 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Jeremy Neil James Christopher Dussek | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Christopher John Smith | Trustee | 14 May 2017 |
|
|||||||||
ALBERT PAUL HARRIS | Trustee | 21 May 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.26k | £42.80k | £43.34k | £44.06k | £36.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.57k | £40.12k | £41.07k | £28.19k | £29.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 November 2020 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 23RD NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (2) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. (3) IN EXCEPTIONAL CASES THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO ASSIST SOMEONE (WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED) WHO IS: (A) RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT; OR (B) ONLY TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF WHITCHURCH, LUDLOW, ELLESMERE AND HANMER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Dodington
WHITCHURCH
Shropshire
SY13 1DZ
- Phone:
- 01948 663184
- Email:
- jane@rylands.me.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window