SAMUEL HIGGINSON ALMSHOUSES CHARITY

Charity number: 242738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing housing for elderley

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £18,622
Total expenditure: £22,633

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 October 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHARITY OF SAMUEL HIGGINSON (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wendy Marie Kay Trustee 24 May 2024
JANE HIGGINSON CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Christopher Precious Trustee 10 March 2024
SIR JOHN TALBOT'S SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
JANE HIGGINSON CHARITY
Received: On time
THE LICHFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE (INCORPORATED)
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST ALKMUND'S WHITCHURCH
Received: On time
James Andrew Hall Trustee 17 November 2022
None on record
Simon Hamlyn Trustee 19 November 2020
None on record
Christopher John Smith Trustee 15 February 2017
THE WHITCHURCH COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST (KNOWN LOCALLY AS BROWNLOW COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST)
Received: On time
HIGHER WYCH SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
JANE HIGGINSON CHARITY
Received: On time
ALBERT PAUL HARRIS Trustee 21 May 2014
JANE HIGGINSON CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.43k £15.79k £18.51k £16.12k £18.62k
Total expenditure £6.87k £10.04k £10.70k £6.80k £22.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
28 Dodington
WHITCHURCH
Shropshire
SY13 1DZ
Phone:
07985212529
Website:

No information available