OLD FARNLEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities include a diverse range of services & providers, including Monday Luncheon club, Tuesday evening Bingo, Boxercise, two sessions per week of early years sessions, Neighbourhood Action have various sessions including a Coffee Morning & Gentle Exercise, Leeds Youth Service operates on a Friday evening with a Junior & Senior's session. The Centre also operates and runs the Farnley Foodbank
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,109 from 3 government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 07 July 1965: Standard registration
- 14 November 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 14 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1206552 OLD FARNLEY & DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- CONCLOSE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.23k | £17.02k | £7.52k | £19.56k | £19.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.12k | £11.50k | £11.55k | £20.95k | £11.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | £200 | £11.27k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD FEBRUARY 1961 AND AMENDED 17TH AUGUST 1988. as amended on 24 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFITS OF THE INHABITANTS OF OLD FARNLEY AND DISTRICT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHIMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
OLD FARNLEY AND DISTRICT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window