THE DENNIS BYRNE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CONTRIBUTIONS TO REGISTERED CHARITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 July 1965: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 July 2014: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Mary Ryan | Trustee | 28 November 1973 |
|
|
||||
PETER D BYRNE | Trustee | 28 November 1973 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.65k | £5.13k | £6.23k | £7.08k | £7.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.70k | £5.56k | £3.85k | £4.95k | £4.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH DECEMBER 1960
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND PURPOSES AS THE SETTLOR SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOPE HOUSE
ST. PETERS STREET
BISHOPS WALTHAM
SOUTHAMPTON
SO32 1AD
- Phone:
- 01489894180
- Email:
- pbyrne@sdalogic.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window