FRED PENDLEBURY TRUST LEGACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing financial assistance for individuals, aged 50 and over, born or living in Warrington. Funding of some Warrington Community Groups who cater for people aged 50 and over.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Warrington
Governance
- 18 August 1965: Standard registration
- THE PENDLEBURY TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sue Rigby | Chair | 19 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Cllr Wendy Johnson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JAMES ROGERS | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Kenneth Long | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|||||
REV Mark Coles | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Richard Verrill | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.26k | £34.61k | £34.70k | £36.44k | £35.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.04k | £31.02k | £31.99k | £29.83k | £32.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 20 JULY 1977 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 5 JUNE 2007 & 26 JANUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/07/2015 as amended on 06 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS OF 50 YEARS OF AGE OR OVER WHO WERE BORN OR ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 19 OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
STOCKTON HEATH AND FORMER WARRINGTON COUNTY BOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Olive Tree Community Centre
Penketh Methodist Church
Chapel Road
Penketh
WARRINGTON
WA5 2NB
- Phone:
- +447982452769
- Email:
- svmtrusts@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window