ENTON HALL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trustees have agreed to distribute £5000 per annum commencing July 2009 for a period of five years making a total contibution of £25000 out of existing and future income for the construction of a treatment room at the British School of Osteopathy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 September 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Nicole Aldridge | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Bruce Harris | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.32k | £16.07k | £20.65k | £24.62k | £21.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.86k | £5.80k | £6.80k | £41.50k | £6.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 February 2025 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 November 2024 | 392 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 November 2024 | 757 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 November 2024 | 1122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1643 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1643 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED OF 1ST MAY 1965.
Charitable objects
A CENTRE AND CLINIC FOR NATURE CURE HEALING NATURE CURE EDUCATION AND ORGANIC HUSBANDRY AND FOR THE PROMOTION OF NATURE CURE RESEARCH AND THE SCIENTIFIC PROOF OF NATURE CURE PRINCIPLES. FOR THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OR SCHOLARSHIPS TO SELECTED STUDENTS ATTENDING THE BRITISH COLLEGE OF NATUROPATHY AND OSTEOPATHY. TO PROMOTE PUBLICATION OF A NATURE CURE JOURNAL TO BE KNOWN AS "ENTON HALL NEWS" AND THE PUBLICATION OF BOOKS OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL RELATING TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF NATURE CURE PRINCIPLES TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Millers Close
North Leigh
North Leigh
North Leigh
Oxon
- Phone:
- 01872 501759
- Email:
- newton.grant82@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window