CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, OXTED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church has an online Sunday service every Sunday and an hybrid service twice a month including Sunday school at 10 am. On the 2nd and 4th Wednesdays of the month, an online open meeting is held to share healings and experiences resulting from the study and practice of Christian Science. The church also maintains a reading room in Oxted, open to the public every weekday except Wednesday.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 29 June 1965: Standard registration
- 10 March 2020: Funds received from 1163453 CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, EASTBOURNE
- CHRISTIAN SCIENCE SOCIETY, OXTED (Working name)
- FIRST CHURCH OF CHRIST, SCIENTIST, OXTED (Previous name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Lacy | Chair | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Ann Ferdinand | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Margaret Howells | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.71k | £18.52k | £59.01k | £12.00k | £17.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.94k | £19.51k | £19.47k | £17.99k | £31.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 7TH SEPTEMBER 1940. as amended on 22 Mar 2018 as amended on 22 Mar 2018 as amended on 19 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN AND SPREAD THE TRUTH AS SET FORTH IN THE BIBLE AND INTERPRETED IN "SCIENCE AND HEALTH WITH KEY TO THE SCRIPTURES" BY MARY BAKER EDDY THE DISCOVERER AND FOUNDER OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE.
Area of benefit
OXTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christian Science Society
Church Lane
OXTED
RH8 9LQ
- Phone:
- 01883 715552
- Email:
- clerkcssoxted@gmail.com
- Website:
-
christianscienceoxted.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window