THE ELLAND SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We give grants to men and women who are in training for the ordained ministry of the Church of England who are sponsored by an english diocese. Grants are only given for items not included in a main church grant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 September 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Emma Elizabeth Walters | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|||||||
Rev Daniel Chung Christian | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Stephanie Anne Price | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Ian Johnston | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Revd Canon James Timothy Allison | Trustee | 11 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Andrew James Dunlop | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev PAUL ROGER HARFORD | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|||||||
Rev Nicholas James Moore | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Colin Ivor Judd | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Rev Susan Irene Penfold | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.95k | £8.17k | £8.40k | £10.09k | £8.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.07k | £7.15k | £8.97k | £9.54k | £8.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AS AMENDED 14TH MAY 1959
Charitable objects
GRANTS TO MARRIED MEN, DESIROUS OF OBTAINING HOLY ORDERS, TO HELP THEM TO SECURE THE ADVANTAGE OF AN EDUCATION AT ONE OR OTHER OF THE OLDER ENGLISH UNIVERSITIES, OXFORD OR CAMBRIDGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
239 Parkside
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL1 5TG
- Phone:
- 07919090699
- Email:
- secretary@ellandsociety.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window