THE MITCHEL TROY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDING A VENUE FOR A NUMBER OF NON PROFIT MAKING ORGANISATIONS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 03 November 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID LlEWELLYN | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARK LEWIS | Trustee | 18 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARY WATTS | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE LONG | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROGER ANTHONY HARDY HARTWELL | Trustee | 17 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.09k | £10.74k | £4.06k | £9.57k | £26.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.10k | £8.49k | £7.17k | £9.08k | £9.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 May 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 09/12/1976 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/06/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF MITCHEL TROY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF.
Area of benefit
MITCHELL-TROY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
GARROW HOUSE
MITCHEL TROY
MONMOUTH
NP25 4JQ
- Phone:
- 01600713783
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window