CHARITY OF ELIZABETH DALBY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 07 July 1965: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- MRS DALBY'S CHARITY (Working name)
- THE CHARITY OF ELIZABETH DALBY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60 | £721 | £700 | £700 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 03 December 2008 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 19TH OCTOBER 1898.
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN THE PURCHASE OF BREAD MEAT COAL BLANKETS OR OTHER ARTICLES OF CLOTHING TO BE DISTRIBUTED ON ST. THOMAS'S DAY IN EVERY YEAR AMONGST THE DESERVING POOR.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WHITWICK.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window