Financial history COOK'S BETHEL OTHERWISE SEAMAN'S BETHEL

Charity number: 243256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.00k £23.45k £38.21k £19.19k £24.48k
Total expenditure £13.23k £6.40k £28.39k £10.12k £7.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £18.78k N/A N/A