JAMES WILLIAM GIFFORD CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE TRUST MAKES GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS OR GROUPS LIVING OR WORKING WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE PARISH OF CHARD, SOMERSET, WHO HAVE FINANCIAL NEED OR ASSISTANCE WITH THEIR DAY-TO-DAY LIVING.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Somerset
Governance
- 12 July 1965: Standard registration
- 09 June 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 September 2012: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BILL FREESTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Ann Kember | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
RUTH MARGARET COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANGELA ANNE GERTRUDE LOUISE LOADER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ANDREW PETER GLANVILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.27k | £2.32k | £2.36k | £2.42k | £2.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.06k | £3.26k | £1.80k | £813 | £1.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 15/10/1962. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION S74 CA93 DATED 30/10/98.
Charitable objects
BENEFIT OF THE SICK POOR IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS - (1) THE SUPPLY OF BEDDING, COMFORTS, FOOD, FUEL, MEDICAL AND OTHER AIDS. (2) GRANTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE SICK INFIRM CONVALESCENT OR IN NEED OF REST OR CHANGE OF AIR, TO DEFRAY THE EXPENSE OF RECUPERATIVE HOLIDAYS AND OF OBTAINING DOMESTIC HELP. (3) THE DONATION OF MONEY IN AID OF THE FUNDS OF ANY CONVALESCENT HOME OR OTHER INSTITUTION OR ORGANISATION ESTABLISHED OR TO BE ESTABLISHED FOR CARE AND RELIEF OF SICK POOR PERSONS UPON TERMS THAT WILL ENSURE THAT THE BENEFITS OF THE INSTITUTION OR ORGANISATION ARE AVAILABLE FOR THE SICK POOR OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF CHARD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O The Parish Office
St Mary's Church Centre
Holyrood Street
Chard
Somerset
TA20 2DN
- Phone:
- 07432635180
- Email:
- lynseylawrence@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window