Linked charities ELIZABETH CATHERINE FARMER
Charity number: 243292
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 8 OCTOBER 1952 AND SCHEME OF 13 JUNE 1902 AS AMENDED ON 21 DECEMBER 1995 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
FOR THE MAINTENANCE, RELIEF OR COMFORT OF THE POOR PEOPLE IN THE TOWNSHIP OF KIRKBURTON.
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIP OF KIRKBURTON
Registration history
- 16 July 1965 : Standard registration
- 15 February 1996 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.