C E ELIOT-COHEN'S CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 243300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The activities of the Charity are for the furtherance of such charitable purposes as the Trustees think fit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 22 March 2024

Total income: £28,663
Total expenditure: £19,726

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bracknell Forest
  • Reading
  • Slough
  • West Berkshire
  • Wiltshire
  • Windsor And Maidenhead
  • Wokingham
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 July 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN VERONICA ELIOT-COHEN Trustee
THE FRIENDS OF HOLY CROSS CHURCH RAMSBURY
Received: On time
TIMOTHY EDWARD ELIOT-COHEN Trustee
THE DAVID LEWIS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 22/03/2020 22/03/2021 22/03/2022 22/03/2023 22/03/2024
Total gross income £17.15k £16.18k £15.87k £18.34k £28.66k
Total expenditure £17.09k £17.81k £19.32k £17.77k £19.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 22 March 2023 01 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 22 March 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 22 March 2021 09 February 2022 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 22 March 2020 29 January 2022 372 days late
Accounts and TAR 22 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hilldrop Farm
Hilldrop
Ramsbury
MARLBOROUGH
Wiltshire
SN8 2HB
Phone:
01512366666
Website:

No information available