Accounts and annual returns THE RADNORSHIRE SOCIETY

Charity number: 243372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 19 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 13 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 September 2020 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required