Financial history BRITISH HOSPITAL AT PORT SAID FUND

Charity number: 243384
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £70.63k £72.28k £76.23k £59.17k £77.68k
Total expenditure £103.24k £81.19k £78.22k £69.93k £23.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A