THE VILLAGE HALL, MICKLEHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a venue for a variety of community and private functions and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 July 1965: Standard registration
- MICKLEHAM VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Feena Julianna Barros Graham | Trustee | 22 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Mark Davis | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN DAVID WALTER KENNINGTON | Trustee | 23 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jane Budd | Trustee | 31 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK FRANCIS BENJAMIN TATHAM | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|||||
WENDY ANN TICKNER | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA ROSEMARY GILCHRIST | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BRIAN WILCOX | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARY GERREY BANFIELD | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN ARTHUR BLAKE | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PHILIP BUTLER | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM RICHARD SIBERRY QC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.22k | £20.09k | £28.58k | £26.25k | £22.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.15k | £19.17k | £25.47k | £17.99k | £24.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.19k | £16.10k | £4.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14/04/1902 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/05/2011
Charitable objects
HALL TO BE USED FOR SPIRITUAL, MORAL, SOCIAL OR INTELLECTURAL WANTS OF PROFESSING MEMEBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND SUBJECT THERETO TO BE USED FOR LECTURES, CONCERTS, DRAMATIC PERFORMANCES AND OTHER PURPOSES AS SET OUT IN THE DEED OF 14 APRIL 1902
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MICKLEHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONGBURY
LONDON ROAD
MICKLEHAM
DORKING
RH5 6DL
- Phone:
- 01372374730
- Email:
- dbrianwilcox@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window