Accounts and annual returns THE CHARITY OF THE REVD GEORGE WALLS, D D

Charity number: 243406
Charity reporting is overdue by 1802 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 341 days
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 341 days
Annual return 02 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 707 days
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 707 days
Annual return 02 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1072 days
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1072 days
Annual return 02 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1437 days
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1437 days
Annual return 02 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1802 days
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1802 days