YMCA WHITE ROSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children's Day Care Nursery Young People's Emotional Well-Being and Counselling
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Wakefield
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 12 October 1965: Standard registration
- 12 October 2012: Funds received from 250207 CHANTRY YOUNG MENS CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION INCORPOR...
- SHEFFIELD Y M C A (Previous name)
- THE SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICT YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip John Batchford | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Janet Lillian Hough | Trustee | 08 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE MUSSETT | Trustee | 26 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HOUGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CHARLES ABEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £223.77k | £336.77k | £279.94k | £119.95k | £116.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £301.25k | £316.02k | £251.17k | £198.84k | £149.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £17.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £7.69k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/04/1906 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/1959 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/02/1984 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/04/2011
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE CAUSE AND WORK OF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS (FOR FURTHER DETAILS, SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES)
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
My Place Rotherham
St Annes Road
Rotherham
South Yorkshire
S65 1PH
- Phone:
- 01709720040
- Website:
-
ymcawhiterose.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window