LITTLE HOUGHTON CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of accommodation or relief as required for those in need Repair and mintenance of the parish church in Little Houghton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 11 August 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN EDWARD STANTON | Trustee | 05 November 2014 |
|
|||||||||
JOHN FORD | Trustee | 04 May 2004 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.12k | £22.11k | £24.91k | £25.98k | £29.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.45k | £34.02k | £39.39k | £24.91k | £14.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 4 MAY 2004.
Charitable objects
1. A) TO RETAIN THE COTTAGES FOR THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES B) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. C) IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECT SPECIFIED IN SUB CLAUSES (A) AND (B) ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY IT TOWARDS THE REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE IF THE CHURCH IF ST MARY THE VIRGIN IN THE PARISH OF LITTLE HOUGHTON, IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTON ("THE PARISH CHURCH"). 2. THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE THE PERSONS IN NEED BY: A) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR B) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR C) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED. 3) EXCEPTIONALLY, THE TRUSTEES MAY BE ABLE TO ASSIST SOMEONE (WHO IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED UNDER SUB CLAUSES (1)(A) OF (B) WHO IS: A) RESIDENT OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT; OR B) ONLY TEMPORARILY RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LITTLE HOUGHTON, IN THE COUNTY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 BEDFORD ROAD
LITTLE HOUGHTON
NORTHAMPTON
NN7 1AB
- Phone:
- 01604890584
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window