THE MONTAGUE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes, education/training, religious activities. Helping children/young people, elderly people, other charitable or voluntary bodies, other defined group, the general public..
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 16 July 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jonathan Gordon | Chair | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
KAREN DRAPER | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Connor Harris | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Murial Crooks | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Simmonds | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Papworth | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.46k | £1.30k | £2.59k | £2.59k | £2.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34k | £1.47k | £1.32k | £2.49k | £2.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 18TH JUNE 1912
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF NEWBALD VERDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 The Paddock
Newbold Verdon
LEICESTER
LE9 9NW
- Phone:
- 01455824234
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window