The Earl & Countess of Harewood's Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the charity is to distribute the income generated by these gifts to any such charitable organisation, purpose or object which the Trustees may from time to time think fit. The single activity in relation to this objective was that the Settlement continued to make donations to local and national charities and appeals with its charitable purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 June 1969: Standard registration
- LORD HAREWOOD'S CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT (Previous name)
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Countess of Harewood | Trustee | 27 June 2016 |
|
|||
EARL OF HAREWOOD DAVID HENRY GEORGE LASCELLES | Trustee | 21 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.19k | £7.10k | £8.03k | £7.46k | £10.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.70k | £15.86k | £78.76k | £60.23k | £16.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 16TH JANUARY 1964 as amended on 03 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER IN ALL RESPECTS AS THEY SHALL THINK FIT APPLY THE INCOME AND THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND IN OR TOWARDS THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR OBJECT OR PURPOSES OR OBJECTS AND IF MORE THAN ONE IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harewood Estate
Harewood Yard
Harewood
LEEDS
LS17 9LF
- Phone:
- 01132181223
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window