CHARITY OF JOHN ABELL FOR BRIDGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Repairs to Nayland Bridge between Gt Horkesley in Essex & Nayland in Suffolk. Will dated 4/1/1523 & scheme of 1/4/1921. Income split 50/50 between Suffolk and Essex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 26 July 1965: Standard registration
- 30 September 2009: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3 | £5 | £5 | £5 | £7 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 11 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 14 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 14 September 2007 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 12 February 2007 | 377 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 4TH JANUARY 1523 (U.V. 1 P. 165) SCHEME OF 1ST APRIL 1921
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE APPLIED AS TO ONE HALF THEREOF BY THE COUNCIL OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF ESSEX AND AS TO THE OTHER HALF THEREOF BY THE COUNCIL OF THE ADMINISTRIVE COUNTY OF WEST SUFFOLK TOWARDS THE COST OF REPAIRING AND MAINTAINING THE BRIDGE OVER THE RIVER BETWEEN THE PARISHES OF GREAT HORKESLEY IN ESSEX AND NAYLAND IN THE COUNTY OF SUFFOLK.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF GREAT HORKESLEY AND NAYLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window