CHARITIES OF LADY ABERGAVENNY AND WILLIAM WYKES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Quarterly payments with additional payments at Christmas. Ad hoc gifts as approved by the Trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 19 August 1965: Standard registration
- 13 April 2023: Funds received from 307596 ABERGAVENNY AND WYKES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
- Horsmonden Charities (Working name)
- LADY ABERGAVENNY AND WILLIAM WYKES CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN KENNEDY BLACK | Chair | 21 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Alison Claire Adams | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Cobley | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Sharp | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Kate Hart-Dyke | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Dixon | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL RIGBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.07k | £2.16k | £2.05k | £7.24k | £3.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.42k | £3.08k | £2.93k | £3.25k | £5.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28/04/1965
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HORSMONDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wagtails
Brenchley Road
Horsmonden
TONBRIDGE
Kent
TN12 8DN
- Phone:
- 01892 725581
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window