FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rents collected from Allotment holders and paddock holder are (after any necessary expenses) distrubted, upon application, to those needy of the village.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 04 August 1965: Standard registration
- Arminghall Fuel Allotment Charity (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Hartley | Trustee | 23 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ann Symonds | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Drake | Trustee | 25 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lyn Marsh | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/01/2020 | 03/01/2021 | 03/01/2022 | 03/01/2023 | 03/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.82k | £5.58k | £6.65k | £818 | £560 | |
|
Total expenditure | £258 | £218 | £4.38k | £606 | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 January 2024 | 11 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 January 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 January 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 January 2021 | 04 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 January 2020 | 04 December 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ACT OF 40 GEORGE III (PR VOL 29 PART 1 PAGE 736) AS AMENDED 17/09/2017
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE
Area of benefit
ARMINGHALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Church Close
Arminghall
Norwich
Norfolk
NR14 8SE
- Phone:
- 01508491675
- Email:
- afat.clerk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window