Financial history CHARITY OF RICHARD CRANE

Charity number: 243674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £275 £275 £275 £275 £275
Total expenditure £400 £480 £300 £0 £575
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A