CHARITY OF RICHARD CRANE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Educational Funding
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 11 August 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Booth | Chair |
|
||||||
Rev Nigel Gordon Byard | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Julie Alderman | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Charlotte Cowie | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Gary Paterson | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Julia Patricia Pearson | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|||||
ELAINE TURNER | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|||||
MARGARET A OSBORNE | Trustee | 21 June 2011 |
|
|||||
GRAHAM HENRY JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £275 | £275 | £275 | £275 | £275 | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | £480 | £300 | £0 | £575 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2025 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 April 2025 | 532 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED AT CANTERBURY IN 1615. (SEE P.R. 32 PT 5 P.297) AND SCHEME OF 24 FEBRUARY 1914.
Charitable objects
ANNUAL INCOME TO BE DISTRIBUTED AMONGST THE POOREST PERSONS OF THE PARISH AT THE YEAR'S END AT THE DISCRETION OF THE MINISTER AND CHURCHWARDENS, AND IF ANY SUCH PERSON SHOULD HAVE A CHILD READY TO BE APPRENTICED THEN 40S. OF THE INTEREST OF THE SAID PRINCIPAL FUND SHOULD BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BITTESWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Walnut Close
Bitteswell
LUTTERWORTH
Leicestershire
LE17 4DG
- Phone:
- 07836231377
- Email:
- johnpatbooth1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window