THE WORTHING TABERNACLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Worthing Tabernacle's main purpose is to make disciples of the Lord Jesus Christ, baptising them into the name of the Father, and of the Son, and of the Holy Spirit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 18 January 1966: Standard registration
- 01 November 2021: Funds received from 248916 EBENEZER FAMILY TRUST
- THE TAB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Richard James Owen | Chair | 10 July 2013 |
|
|||||
Grant Campbell | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tony Stubbs | Trustee | 10 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Steve Mason | Trustee | 18 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Howard Barnes-Moss | Trustee | 21 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Campbell | Trustee | 15 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Cook | Trustee | 04 June 2008 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £314.53k | £554.35k | £274.63k | £233.38k | £209.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £349.64k | £290.13k | £305.11k | £241.29k | £226.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £518.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £35.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £293 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £287.98k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £257.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £32.32k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £2.20k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £39.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 December 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 December 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 June 2024 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 June 2024 | 238 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEEDS DATED 10 MAY 1897 AND 15 DECEMBER 1923 AND SCHEME OF 29 JANUARY 1981 AS AMENDED BY ORDER OF 7 FEBRUARY 2006, AND AS AMENDED 7 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
(1) TO BE USED AND OCCUPIED AS A DWELLING HOUSE BY THE PASTOR OR MINISTER OR ONE OF THE MINISTERS APPOINTED BY THE WORTHING TABERNACLE. (2) TO EITHER AUGMENT THE STIPEND OF THE MINISTER FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE WORTHING TABERNACLE CHURCH AT WORTHING, OR TOWARDS THE UPKEEP AND REPAIR OF THE SAID CHURCH AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES THEREIN IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORTHING
Contact information
- Address:
-
Worthing Tabernacle
64 Chapel Road
Worthing
West Sussex
BN11 1BN
- Phone:
- 01903236542
- Email:
- admin@worthingtab.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window