THE DICKINSON MEMORIAL COTTAGES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of housing for poor elderly people. Both cottages occupied.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 28 September 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Nicholas Dickinson | Chair | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ed Surman | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Ian William Lewis Parker | Trustee | 21 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.84k | £5.10k | £1.36k | £1.92k | £1.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.21k | £1.59k | £1.26k | £7.99k | £1.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 113 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 479 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 April 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 April 2023 | 424 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 April 2023 | 789 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 31 MAY 1994
Charitable objects
PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO POOR PERSONS WHO ARE 50 YEARS OF AGE OR MORE AND WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA COMPRISINS THE PARISHES OF LAMPLUGH, ENNERDALE AND KINNISIDE, AND DEAN AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 29 OF THE AFORESAID SCHEME)
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF LAMPLUGH, ENNERDALE AND KINNISIDE, AND DEAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTLEY GREEN FARM
NETTLESTEAD
IPSWICH
IP8 4QS
- Phone:
- 01473839191
- Email:
- j.dickinson2@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window