Governing document CHARLES EDWARD SUGDEN'S ALMSHOUSES
Charity Number: 243833

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON 11/07/1916 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 12/04/1929 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/11/1938 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29/08/1969 AS AMENDED 26/12/12 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
HOMES FOR AGED OR INFIRM PERSONS, INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKWORTH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OAKWORTH
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.