THE SALISBURY ST THOMAS AND ST EDMUND CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieving either generally or individually persons resident in the ecclesiastical deanery of Salisbury who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress by making grants of money or providing for items, services or facilities calculated to reduce the need, hardship or distress of such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 April 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev KELVIN JOHN INGLIS MTH | Chair | 04 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Kerry Ruth Badger | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Herbert John Ledingham | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL ROBERT DUDLEY ORCHARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH AMANDA CHETTLEBURGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.88k | £3.96k | £4.07k | £4.12k | £8.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.32k | £3.69k | £2.69k | £6.22k | £5.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 16 APRIL 1982 as amended on 22 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL DEANERY OF SALISBURY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SALISBURY ST. THOMAS AND ST. EDMUND
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. THOMAS'S HOUSE
ST. THOMAS'S SQUARE
SALISBURY
SP1 1BA
- Phone:
- 01722322537
- Email:
- sttcharities@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window