HOYLAKE CHAMBER CONCERT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public concerts and recitals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Wirral
Governance
- 28 July 1965: Standard registration
- H C C S (Working name)
- Investment
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HA-IL KIM | Chair | 05 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Diane Rushworth | Trustee | 08 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Christine Williams | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elaine Christina Sanderson | Trustee | 24 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PAUL TIMOTHY BAINES | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
David John Stevenson | Trustee | 19 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KATHARINE JANE CLARE HOOPER | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
LAWRENCE EDWARD GARTSIDE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.12k | £239 | £5.02k | £11.68k | £16.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.58k | £636 | £5.86k | £9.66k | £10.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20/04/1950 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2014 as amended on 04 Aug 2021 as amended on 04 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS
Area of benefit
HOYLAKE AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Salisbury Avenue
West Kirby
WIRRAL
CH48 0QP
- Phone:
- 01516255440
- Email:
- wirralconcerts@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window