THE HAROLD BEAL TRUST FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of Poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 October 1965: Standard registration
- 21 December 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.99k | £3.92k | £4.49k | £1.72k | £1.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 07 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 17 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27TH JANUARY 1965.
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE INCOMBE TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SUFFERED BY ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES OF JOHN BEAL & SON (STATIONERS) LTD., AD THE WIDOWS, WIDOWERS AND CHILDREN OF SUCH EMPLOYEES AND FORMER EMPLOYEES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window