STEMPEL CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants are made to charitable institutions and organisations in accordance with the objects of the charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 07 October 1965: Standard registration
- 29 August 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 29 August 2024: Funds transferred to 278823 KAHAL CHASSIDIM BOBOV
- STEMPEL CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16 | £5 | £1 | £35 | £86 | |
|
Total expenditure | £60 | £5 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 May 2023 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 MARCH 1965.
Charitable objects
FOR OR TO LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES OR LEGALLY CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE INCLUDING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE OF THE JEWISH FAITH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH RELIGION AND THE STUDY OF THE TORAH.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window