OTLEY LADIES SICK VISITING SOCIETY
Charity Number: 243951
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
Total income: £131
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
No information available
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
No information available
Where the charity operates:
- Leeds City
Governance
Registration history:
- 09 August 1965: Standard registration
- 18 May 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £150 | £157 | £113 | £131 | |
|
Total expenditure | £133 | £157 | £153 | £133 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 22 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 14 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 27 March 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 21 February 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF 1865
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICK AND POOR WOMEN
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
TOWNSHIP OF OTLEY
Linked charities
Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PPROVED AT PRINCIPAL REGISTRY 7 OCTOBER 1927
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE OTLEY LADIES SICK VISITING SOCIETY
Area of benefit
TOWNSHIP OF OTLEY
Registration history
- 09 August 1965 : Standard registration
- 18 May 2009 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window