Financial history CATHOLIC MEN'S SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity Number: 243989
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £5.87k £2.70k £4.47k £4.37k £4.82k
Total expenditure £6.16k £1.98k £5.63k £5.18k £5.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A