THE RELIGIOUS OF CHRISTIAN INSTRUCTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Institute has continued to fulfil its principal aims through the education and formation of religious sisters, by teaching, pastoral and other work at the two schools in Effingham and by care and pastoral work in the parishes of Sherborne and Effingham and elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 August 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sister CARMEL HELLER | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SISTER PAULINE | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAUL AUSTIN | Trustee | 29 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
SISTER BREDE KENNEDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SISTER JOSEPHINE O'FLAHERTY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.19k | £119.41k | £116.04k | £132.55k | £137.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.70k | £88.60k | £159.93k | £138.53k | £197.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 August 2024 | 398 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 August 2024 | 398 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 MAY 1965 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15 SEP 2010
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK CARRIED ON IN ENGLAND AND WALES BY THE SOCIETY AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE APPROVAL OF THE SUPERIOR SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST ANTONY'S CONVENT
5-6 West Terrace
Westbury
SHERBORNE
DT9 3ER
- Phone:
- 02079695657
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window