Trustees LANE END VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 244024

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHEILA ANN KEATINGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kath Gill | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tomasz Lipinski | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ritchard Tysoe | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Croxon | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Bolton | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Nicolson | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Hartnett | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Croxson | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anna Bacon | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HARNETT | Trustee | 09 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER STANLEY ROSE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.