SIR JOB CHARLTON'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 244045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Almshouses

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £28,200
Total expenditure: £27,699

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 August 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALISON CUNDALL Chair 01 July 2024
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
LOUISA POWELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Jean Jarvis MBE Trustee 01 July 2024
LOUISA POWELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Hilary Delaney Hall Trustee 01 July 2024
LOUISA POWELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Tim Gill Trustee 01 July 2024
LOUISA POWELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Juliet Diamond Trustee 01 July 2024
LOUISA POWELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
MARK PAINTER Trustee 01 July 2024
LOUISA POWELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Imogen Liddle Trustee 01 July 2024
LOUISA POWELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
Thomas O'Boyle Trustee 01 July 2024
LOUISA POWELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
PETER WILLIAMS Trustee 01 July 2024
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
LOUISA POWELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev John Beesley Trustee 01 July 2024
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Nicholas Holcombe Trustee 01 April 2016
ELIZABETH MASSEY'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
LOUISA POWELL'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
HOSYER-FOXE CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.86k £22.60k £27.76k £26.39k £28.20k
Total expenditure £23.18k £21.00k £21.94k £28.53k £27.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 27 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 27 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 August 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 JOCKEY FIELD
LUDLOW
SY8 1PU
Phone:
01584874661
Website:

No information available