WORLD CONGRESS OF FAITHS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Publishes a biannual Journal, Interreligious Insight, and occasional books. Runs lectures, conferences, retreats etc. Works with other interfaith organisations. A personal membership educational charity established 1936.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 May 1966: Standard registration
- WORLD CONGRESS OF FAITHS (INTERFAITH FELLOWSHIP) (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV CANON DR ALAN RACE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jitendra Dave | Trustee | 18 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Imam Monowar Hussein | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sister Georgina Long | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barney Leith | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MAQSOOD AHMED | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev Bonnie Evans-Hills | Trustee | 16 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Pejman Khojasteh | Trustee | 01 May 2007 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Marcus Braybrooke | Trustee | 01 January 1980 |
|
|
||||
Dr VINOD KAPASHI OBE | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev Feargus O'Connor | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AJIT SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SWADEKA AHSUN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RABBI JACQUELINE TABICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.38k | £11.30k | £14.04k | £11.23k | £15.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.46k | £20.75k | £9.81k | £7.39k | £10.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL MEETING 2ND APRIL 1966 AND 1ST APRIL 1989 AND 13 MAY 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE RELIGIOUS EDUCATION BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF THE RELIGIOUS FAITHS SECTS AND DENOMINATIONS OF THE WORLD BY PROMOTING THE STUDY OF COMPARATIVE RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 1
Home Farm
Sugnall
STAFFORD
ST21 6NF
- Phone:
- 07747 612327
- Email:
- admin@worldfaiths.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window