MORRISTON-DAVIES SETTLEMENT IN CONNECTION WITH THE BRITISH THORACIC ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a scholarship to be called the 'Morriston Davies Scholarship' to be awarded annually to a doctor or nurse for the furtherance of research into the prevention, treatment and cure of tuberculosis and other respiratory desease. The Trustees have complied with the duty in Section 4 of the Charity Act 2006 to have due regard to public benefit guidance published by the Charity Commission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 October 1965: Standard registration
- MORRISTON-DAVIES SETTLEMENT IN CONNEXION WITH THE BRITISH THORACIC AND TUBERCULOSIS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr SIMON PAUL HART | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Hill | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
NEIL MCANDREW | Trustee | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
LLOYDS BANK PLC | Trustee | 20 August 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.25k | £121.99k | £24.84k | £25.94k | £23.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.55k | £138.37k | £12.72k | £8.91k | £40.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 May 2024 | 480 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 06 March 2024 | 395 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 29 April 2021 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 26TH JULY 1965
Charitable objects
FOR OR TOWARDS EDUCATION IN AND RESEARCH INTO METHODS OF PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF TUBERCULOSIS AND OTHER RESPIRATORY DISEASE AND OTHERWISE FOR OR TOWARDS THE PREVENTION TREATMENT AND CURE OF TUBERCULOSIS AND OTHER RESPIRATORY DISEASE, AND TO PROVIDE AN ANNUAL SCHOLARSHIP TO BE CALLED THE "MORRISTON-DAVIES SCHOLARSHIP" FOR A DOCTOR OR NURSE FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OJBECTS ABOVE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lloyds Banking Group
City Park
The Droveway
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 7AU
- Phone:
- 03453000304
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window