THE TOWN LANDS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 244143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Upkeep of St Peter's Church Yoxall

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 24 June 2024

Total income: £448
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 February 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUDITH RICKARD Trustee 28 April 2022
THE TOWN LANDS NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
TOWN LANDS (ESTATE TRUSTEES)
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF THOMAS AND SARAH TAYLOR
Received: On time
REVEREND JOHN SPATEMAN
Received: On time
UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
Rev Jeremy Clive Brading Trustee 26 November 2021
UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
TOWN LANDS (ESTATE TRUSTEES)
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF THOMAS AND SARAH TAYLOR
Received: On time
THE TOWN LANDS NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/06/2020 24/06/2021 24/06/2022 24/06/2023 24/06/2024
Total gross income £815 £388 £407 £412 £448
Total expenditure £409 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 June 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 24 June 2023 15 July 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 24 June 2022 28 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 24 June 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 24 June 2020 06 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE RECTORY
SAVEY LANE
YOXALL
BURTON-ON-TRENT
DE13 8PD
Phone:
01543472528
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available