Financial history FENCHURCH LODGE BENELOVENT FUND

Charity number: 244175
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2005 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010
Total gross income £196 £3.86k £3.84k £4.32k £5.40k
Total expenditure £196 £4.40k £4.58k £4.89k £4.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A