FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 16 August 1965: Standard registration
- HACKFORD FUEL ALLOTMENT CHARITY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Vitoria Alice Venmore-Rowland | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lee Chilvers | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEITH BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £507 | £440 | £0 | £798 | £315 | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | £400 | £500 | £200 | £380 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AWARD DATED 13TH OCTOBER 1807 IN P.R.VOL. 29 PART 1 P.630
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE LAID OUT IN THE PURCHASE OF FUEL TO BE DISTRIBUTED AMONGST THE POOR OF THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HACKFORD WYMONDHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LODGE
CHURCH LANE
HACKFORD
WYMONDHAM
NR18 9HN
- Phone:
- 01953850619
- Email:
- jperry69@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window